MN HF2036 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Kunesh-Podein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Advance care planning on end-of-life care choices funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advance care planning on end-of-life care choices funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Acomb
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF555 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback