MN HF2033 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Administrative Hearings deficiency funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Administrative Hearings deficiency funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2023-03-20HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2023-03-16HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1816
2023-03-16HouseSecond reading
2023-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2023-03-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2023-02-20HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1816 (Similar To) 2023-04-05 - Secretary of State, Filed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback