MN HF2032 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Environment and natural resources trust funds appropriated, and previous appropriations modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and natural resources trust funds appropriated, and previous appropriations modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-18SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-05-16SenateSecond reading
2019-05-16SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-05-02SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-02SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-02SenateReceived from House
2019-05-01HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-05-01HouseThird reading as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended
2019-04-29HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2019
2019-04-25HouseSecond reading
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-28HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2201 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - HF substituted in committee HF2032

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback