MN HF2028 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chanhassen; Lyman Boulevard upgrade funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Chanhassen; Lyman Boulevard upgrade funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2049 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Capital Investment