MN HF2027 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Volunteer health care provider program requirements modified.
Title
Volunteer health care provider program requirements modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2081 |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2081 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed