MN HF2022 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Claflin
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Electric vehicle charging stations installation in state parks required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric vehicle charging stations installation in state parks required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Claflin
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-14HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2061 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback