MN HF2017 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Hansen, R.
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Hansen, R.
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Task Force on State Employment and Retention of Employees with Disabilities recommendations adopted, and report required.
Title
Advisory Task Force on State Employment and Retention of Employees with Disabilities recommendations adopted, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Hansen, R. |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Feist |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Klevorn, Elkins, and Masin |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF1570 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Author added Clausen