MN HF201 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author changed Grossell as chief author
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in cases of self-defense outside the home common law eliminated, boundaries of dwelling expanded for purposes of self-defense, presumption created in the case of a person entering a dwelling or occupied vehicle by stealth or force, and rights available to a person in that person's dwelling extended to a person defending against entry of that person's occupied vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in cases of self-defense outside the home common law eliminated, boundaries of dwelling expanded for purposes of self-defense, presumption created in the case of a person entering a dwelling or occupied vehicle by stealth or force, and rights available to a person in that person's dwelling extended to a person defending against entry of that person's occupied vehicle.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseAuthor changed Grossell as chief author
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Erickson
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Albright, Daniels, Schomacker, Johnson, Theis, and Backer
2019-01-22HouseAuthors added Poston, Bennett, O'Neill, Grossell, Franson, and Dettmer
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF72 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback