MN HF2009 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health plan companies and commissioner of human services prohibited from requiring enrollees to follow metastatic cancer step therapy protocols.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health plan companies and commissioner of human services prohibited from requiring enrollees to follow metastatic cancer step therapy protocols.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseSecond reading
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Robbins
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF2143 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Author added Utke

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback