MN HF2008 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Children and Families Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Children and Families Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Homeless youth cash stipend pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Homeless youth cash stipend pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
2023-03-06 | House | Authors added Clardy; Norris |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1903 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Author added Mitchell