MN HF2 | 2017 | 90th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus education finance bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus education finance bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Bill passed (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 79 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Urgency declared rules suspended (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Secretary of State Chapter 5
2017-05-30 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-26 Presented to Governor
2017-05-25HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 76-54
2017-05-25HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2017-05-25HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-25HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2017-05-25HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-05-25SenateBill passed vote: 34-28
2017-05-25SenateTaken from table
2017-05-24SenateLaid on table
2017-05-24SenateThird reading
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateTaken from table
2017-05-24SenateLaid on table
2017-05-24SenateSpecial Order
2017-05-24SenateTaken from table
2017-05-23SenateLaid on table
2017-05-23SenateSecond reading
2017-05-23SenateUrgency declared rules suspended vote: 47-17
2017-05-23SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-23SenateReceived from House
2017-05-23HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 79-54
2017-05-23HouseThird reading as amended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseSecond reading
2017-05-23HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2017-05-23HouseIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0002&ssn=1&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&number=16
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0002&session_number=1&year=2017&id=239
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=1&number=62
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0002&session_number=1&year=2017&id=247

Bill Comments

feedback