MN HF1998 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Long
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State-owned buildings solar energy systems and renewable sources provisions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-owned buildings solar energy systems and renewable sources provisions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAuthor added Long
2019-04-01HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-04-01HouseRecalled by Chair Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF2536 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback