MN HF1993 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Volunteer firefighters and EMTs tax credit established.
Title
Volunteer firefighters and EMTs tax credit established.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2254 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Taxes