MN HF1990 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Solar for schools program technical changes made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar for schools program technical changes made.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04HouseSecond reading
2024-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2023-03-06HouseSecond reading
2023-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2023-02-20HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2689 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback