MN HF1985 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric generation and distribution equipment and machinery taxation modified.
Title
Electric generation and distribution equipment and machinery taxation modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2193 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Referred to Taxes