MN HF198 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School districts required to provide access to military, skilled trades, and manufacturing career options.
Title
School districts required to provide access to military, skilled trades, and manufacturing career options.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Pierson, Daniels, Grossell |
2021-05-13 | House | Author added Olson, B. |
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF457 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy