MN HF198 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Inflow and infiltration reduction program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Inflow and infiltration reduction program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] | Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2017-01-17 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Masin. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Funding Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF18 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance