MN HF1979 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 11, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 11, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No-fault automobile insurance reform issues task force established, legislative appointments provided, and report required.
Title
No-fault automobile insurance reform issues task force established, legislative appointments provided, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 11, 2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF957 (Similar To) 2015-04-16 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance