MN HF1979 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Minnesota supplemental aid shelter needy provisions modified, and adult foster care homes modified.
Title
Minnesota supplemental aid shelter needy provisions modified, and adult foster care homes modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Thomas Huntley [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Roger Crawford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2012-03-05 | House | Author added Crawford |
2012-03-05 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections |
2012-01-30 | House | Author added Pelowski |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |