MN HF1975 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State government outside contract restrictions removed, and disclosure required on where contract work takes place.
Title
State government outside contract restrictions removed, and disclosure required on where contract work takes place.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | House | Continued |
2012-04-24 | House | Reported to the House |
2012-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-02-20 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |