MN HF1974 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Author added Davids
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Author added Davids
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School library aid created, school library aid funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
School library aid created, school library aid funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] |
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Josiah Hill [D] | Rep. Kim Hicks [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Davids |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Hicks |
2023-03-01 | House | Authors added Elkins, Wolgamott, and Hill |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1911 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Author added Mann