MN HF1974 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health and substance use disorder work group established, and report required.
Title
Mental health and substance use disorder work group established, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Becker-Finn. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Murphy, E. |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Bliss. |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2028 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy