MN HF1973 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Authors added Freiberg; Feist
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Authors added Freiberg; Feist
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals amended.
Title
State greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Authors added Freiberg; Feist |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2023-02-21 | House | Author added Jordan |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2188 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy