MN HF1968 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State employees with disabilities provisions modified, working group created, and report required.
Title
State employees with disabilities provisions modified, working group created, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Hassan |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-27 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2004 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections