MN HF1965 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Scott and Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Scott and Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voters registered on election day required to cast provisional ballots, and conforming changes made.
Title
Voters registered on election day required to cast provisional ballots, and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Brian Pfarr [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Authors added Scott and Bliss |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davids |
2021-05-06 | House | Author added Pfarr |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF179 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections