MN HF1963 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Chisago County; Interstate Park renamed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chisago County; Interstate Park renamed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseAuthor stricken Davids
2019-03-07HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Policy
2019-03-07HouseAuthor stricken Dettmer
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF2162 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Author added Cohen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback