MN HF1956 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Energy First Act established, electric utilities required to meet resource needs using clean energy resources, biomass definition as eligible energy technology modified, electricity-generating utilities energy proportion from renewable sources increased and target dates goals must be achieved by set, state energy savings policy goal updated and Conservation Improvement Program Modernization Act of 2019 established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy First Act established, electric utilities required to meet resource needs using clean energy resources, biomass definition as eligible energy technology modified, electricity-generating utilities energy proportion from renewable sources increased and target dates goals must be achieved by set, state energy savings policy goal updated and Conservation Improvement Program Modernization Act of 2019 established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Elkins
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Pryor
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Sundin
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF2431 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback