MN HF1945 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regional library systems funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Regional library systems funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1832 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Author added Cwodzinski