MN HF194 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 50 05/09/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 50 05/09/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fraud prevented, money transmissions regulated, no transmit list established, and notifications and verifications required.
Title
Fraud prevented, money transmissions regulated, no transmit list established, and notifications and verifications required.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Will Morgan [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Mary Sawatzky [D] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] |
Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. John Ward [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] | Rep. John Benson [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] |
Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 124 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 50 05/09/13 | |
2013-05-09 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2013-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-06 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 124-7 |
2013-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2013-05-06 | House | Motion prevailed |
2013-05-06 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2013-05-06 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-05-06 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 54-0 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF247 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF247, now on General Orders |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-08 | House | Bill was passed vote: 123-10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2013-03-06 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-01-31 | House | Authors added Benson, J.; Persell; and Simon |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |