MN HF1937 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans and military affairs finance bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans and military affairs finance bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: H.F. NO.1937 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to strike Rule 45 (Y: 32 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15 Secretary of State Chapter 38
2023-05-15 Governor's action Approval
2023-05-15 Secretary of State, Filed
2023-05-15 Governor approval
2023-05-15 Presented to Governor
2023-05-09SenateThird reading
2023-05-09SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2023-05-09SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2023-05-09SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2023-05-09HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2023-05-08HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference
2023-05-08HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2023-05-08HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2023-05-08HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2023-04-25SenateSenate conferees Mitchell; Murphy; Anderson
2023-04-25HouseSenate conferees Mitchell; Murphy; Anderson
2023-04-25HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2023-04-24SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2023-04-24SenateHouse conferees Newton; Elkins; Bliss
2023-04-24SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2023-04-24HouseHouse conferees Newton, Elkins, Bliss
2023-04-21HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2023-04-21HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2023-04-20SenateThird reading Passed
2023-04-20SenateMotion did not prevail to strike Rule 45
2023-04-20SenateSpecial Order
2023-04-19SenateSecond reading
2023-04-19SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2247
2023-04-18SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2247, now on General Orders
2023-04-18SenateIntroduction and first reading
2023-04-18SenateReceived from House
2023-04-18HouseBill was passed as amended
2023-04-18HouseThird reading as amended
2023-04-18HouseAmended
2023-04-17HouseAuthor added Hussein
2023-04-17HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 18, 2023
2023-04-13HouseSecond reading
2023-04-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2023-03-30HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2023-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
2023-02-16HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration

Same As/Similar To

SF2247 (Similar To) 2023-04-19 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1937, SF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1937&ssn=0&y=2023
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1937&version=0&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1937&version=1&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1937&version=2&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1937&version=3&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1937&version=4&session=ls93&session_year=2023&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=HF1937&session_number=0&year=2023&id=264
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage?session=ls93&number=5765
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=93&billnum=HF1937&session_number=0&year=2023&id=501
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage?session=ls93&number=7089

Bill Comments

feedback