MN HF1935 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus state government finance bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus state government finance bill.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2019-04-26HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-04-25HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2227
2019-04-23HouseSecond reading
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-04-09HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2227 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - House conferees Nelson, M.; Freiberg; Ecklund; Dehn; Kiel

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback