MN HF1930 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Authors added Bernardy and Olson, L.
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Authors added Bernardy and Olson, L.
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home-visiting program funding provided for pregnant women and families, and money appropriated.
Title
Home-visiting program funding provided for pregnant women and families, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Bernardy and Olson, L. |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Greenman |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy |