MN HF1929 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's mental health grant service type modified, and money appropriated for the first psychotic episode and first mood disorder grant programs.
Title
Children's mental health grant service type modified, and money appropriated for the first psychotic episode and first mood disorder grant programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF933 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Hoffman