MN HF1923 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author stricken Davids.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author stricken Davids.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy system purchase and installation credit provided.
Title
Solar energy system purchase and installation credit provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Author stricken Davids. |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-06 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1863 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Referred to Taxes