MN HF1922 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Electric vehicle registration additional fee imposed.
Title
Electric vehicle registration additional fee imposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2215 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy