MN HF1917 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Distribution of aid to regional public library systems modified, regional library basic system support aid linked to future increases in basic formula allowance, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribution of aid to regional public library systems modified, regional library basic system support aid linked to future increases in basic formula allowance, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27HouseAuthor added Backer
2023-03-08HouseAuthor added Davids
2023-03-06HouseAuthors added Norris; Hicks
2023-03-01HouseAuthors added Hill and Engen
2023-02-27HouseAuthors added Feist; Murphy
2023-02-16HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF1919 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Author added Mitchell

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback