MN HF1914 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced practice registered nurses added to certain statutes, and medical assistance coverage expanded to orthotic devices.
Title
Advanced practice registered nurses added to certain statutes, and medical assistance coverage expanded to orthotic devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1966 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Second reading