MN HF1902 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Buhl; funding provided for renovation of publicly owned former juvenile treatment facility into mental health and child welfare providing facility, and money appropriated.
Title
Buhl; funding provided for renovation of publicly owned former juvenile treatment facility into mental health and child welfare providing facility, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF779 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy