MN HF190 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Authors added Edelson and Masin
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Statewide parent-to-parent programs for families of children and youth with special health care needs funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide parent-to-parent programs for families of children and youth with special health care needs funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthors added Edelson and Masin
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-01-17HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF215 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Author added Clausen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback