MN HF1892 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prenatal substance use reporting requirements modified.
Title
Prenatal substance use reporting requirements modified.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1865 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Author added Newton