MN HF1887 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - Author added Altendorf
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Closing of places of worship during an emergency declaration prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Closing of places of worship during an emergency declaration prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-22HouseAuthor added Altendorf
2023-03-09HouseAuthor added Knudsen
2023-02-20HouseAuthor added Scott
2023-02-16HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1104 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Author added Howe

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback