MN HF1882 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commercial fishing areas restrictions to provide invasive species control modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial fishing areas restrictions to provide invasive species control modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Lippert
2019-02-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1677 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback