MN HF1881 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Human services commissioner directed to provide child care assistance program billing form notices, child care assistance program provider requirements modified, and criminal penalties provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services commissioner directed to provide child care assistance program billing form notices, child care assistance program provider requirements modified, and criminal penalties provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseAuthor added Robbins
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Haley
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Grossell
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback