MN HF1877 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Critical habitat private sector matching account use modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Critical habitat private sector matching account use modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Morrison |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Lee and Lippert |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2189 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance