MN HF1867 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State agency hearing established for county to dispute liability for a portion of the cost of care of clients in regional treatment centers or state nursing facilities due to delayed discharge, and recovery of disputed costs of care from clients precluded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agency hearing established for county to dispute liability for a portion of the cost of care of clients in regional treatment centers or state nursing facilities due to delayed discharge, and recovery of disputed costs of care from clients precluded.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1982 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback