MN HF1863 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State employee salaries funding appropriated in the event of nonappropriation.
Title
State employee salaries funding appropriated in the event of nonappropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2020-02-13 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Wolgamott and Kunesh-Podein |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1929 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections