MN HF1862 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Becker-Finn
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Becker-Finn
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Financial capability services integrated with taxpayer assistance services grant program created and funding provided, reports required, taxpayer assistance grant program existing appropriation increased, and money appropriated.
Title
Financial capability services integrated with taxpayer assistance services grant program created and funding provided, reports required, taxpayer assistance grant program existing appropriation increased, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Davnie |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1900 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections