MN HF1857 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forest pest response funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Forest pest response funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-09 | House | Authors added Sundin and Ecklund. |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Mahoney. |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1764 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance