MN HF1842 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy incentive program modified, various renewable energy and other energy-related programs established, utility filing governed, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Solar energy incentive program modified, various renewable energy and other energy-related programs established, utility filing governed, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Anne Claflin [D] |
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 84 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: 74 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-15 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 84 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: 74 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 118 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2084 |
2020-05-16 | House | Authors added Richardson, Hansen, and Lillie |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2084, now on General Orders |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-15 | House | Authors added Schultz and Claflin |
2020-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-15 | House | Amendments offered |
2020-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020 |
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-09 | House | Author added Acomb |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2084 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Authors added Goggin; Housley