MN HF1839 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Layman and Neu
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Layman and Neu
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy saving state's policy goal updated and Conservation Improvement Program Modernization Act of 2019 established.
Title
Energy saving state's policy goal updated and Conservation Improvement Program Modernization Act of 2019 established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Layman and Neu |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Erickson |
2019-03-20 | House | Authors added Hamilton and Torkelson |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added O'Neill, Quam, McDonald, and Schomacker |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Davids |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Lueck, Green, Fabian, and Backer |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Poppe, Grossell, and Bennett |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1915 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance